Chief
Justices of Supreme Court of India
|
||||
No.
|
Name
|
Took office
|
Left office
|
Originating
State
|
01
|
15 August 1947
|
16 November 1951
|
||
02
|
16 November 1951
|
3 January 1954
|
||
03
|
3 January 1954
|
22 December 1954
|
||
04
|
22 December 1954
|
31 January 1956
|
||
05
|
31 January 1956
|
30 September 1959
|
||
06
|
30 September 1959
|
31 January 1964
|
||
07
|
31 January 1964
|
15 March 1966
|
||
08
|
16 March 1966
|
29 June 1966
|
||
09
|
30 June 1966
|
11 April 1967
|
||
10
|
12 April 1967
|
24 February 1968
|
||
11
|
25 February 1968
|
16 December 1970
|
present Chattisgarh
|
|
12
|
17 December 1970
|
21 January 1971
|
present Gujarat
|
|
13
|
22 January 1971
|
25 April 1973
|
||
14
|
25 April 1973
|
28 January 1977
|
||
15
|
29 January 1977
|
21 February 1978
|
||
16
|
22 February 1978
|
11 July 1985
|
||
17
|
12 July 1985
|
20 December 1986
|
||
18
|
21 December 1986
|
6 June 1989
|
||
19
|
19 June 1989
|
17 December 1989
|
||
20
|
18 December 1989
|
25 September 1990
|
||
21
|
25 September 1990
|
24 November 1991
|
||
22
|
25 November 1991
|
12 December 1991
|
||
23
|
13 December 1991
|
17 November 1992
|
||
24
|
18 November 1992
|
11 February 1993
|
||
25
|
12 February 1993
|
24 October 1994
|
||
26
|
25 October 1994
|
24 March 1997
|
||
27
|
25 March 1997
|
18 January 1998
|
||
28
|
18 January 1998
|
9 October 1998
|
||
29
|
10 October 1998
|
1 November 2001
|
||
30
|
2 November 2001
|
6 May 2002
|
||
31
|
6 May 2002
|
11 November 2002
|
||
32
|
11 November 2002
|
19 December 2002
|
||
33
|
19 December 2002
|
2 May 2004
|
||
34
|
2 May 2004
|
1 June 2004
|
||
35
|
1 June 2004
|
1 November 2005
|
||
36
|
1 November 2005
|
14 January 2007
|
||
37
|
14 January 2007
|
11 May 2010
|
||
38
|
12 May 2010 (incumbent)
|
Till Date
|
No comments:
Post a Comment