S.N. | Name | Took Office | Left Office |
1 | Sir Chandulal Madhavlal Trivedi | 15 August 1947 | 11 March 1953 |
2 | Sir Chandeshwar Prasad Narayan Singh | 11 March 1953 | 15 September 1958 |
3 | Narahar Vishnu Gadgil | 15 September 1958 | 1 October 1962 |
4 | Pattom Thanu Pillai | 1 October 1962 | 4 May 1964 |
5 | Hafiz Muhammad Ibrahim | 4 May 1964 | 1 September 1965 |
6 | Sardar Ujjal Singh | 1 September 1965 | 26 June 1966 |
7 | Dharma Vira | 27 June 1966 | 1 June 1967 |
8 | Mehar Singh | 1 June 1967 | 16 October 1967 |
9 | D. C. Pavate | 16 October 1967 | 21 May 1973 |
10 | Mahendra Mohan Choudhry | 21 May 1973 | 1 September 1977 |
11 | Ranjit Singh Narula | 1 September 1977 | 24 September 1977 |
12 | Jaisukh Lal Hathi | 24 September 1977 | 26 August 1981 |
13 | Aminuddin Ahmad Khan | 26 August 1981 | 21 April 1982 |
14 | Marri Chenna Reddy | 21 April 1982 | 7 February 1983 |
15 | S.S. Sandhawalia | 7 February 1983 | 21 February 1983 |
16 | Anant Prasad Sharma | 21 February 1983 | 10 October 1983 |
17 | Bhairab Dutt Pande | 10 October 1983 | 3 July 1984 |
18 | Kershasp Tehmurasp Satarawala | 3 July 1984 | 14 March 1985 |
19 | Arjun Singh | 14 March 1985 | 14 November 1985 |
20 | Hokishe Sema | 14 November 1985 | 26 November 1985 |
21 | Shankar Dayal Sharma | 26 November 1985 | 2 April 1986 |
22 | Siddharta Shankar Ray | 2 April 1986 | 8 December 1989 |
23 | Nirmal Mukarji | 8 December 1989 | 14 June 1990 |
24 | Virendra Verma | 14 June 1990 | 18 December 1990 |
25 | General Om Prakash Malhotra | 18 December 1990 | 7 August 1991 |
26 | Surendra Nath | 7 August 1991 | 9 July 1994 |
27 | Sudhakar Panditrao Kurdukar | 10 July 1994 | 18 September 1994 |
28 | Lieutenant General B.K.N. Chhibber | 18 September 1994 | 27 November 1999 |
29 | Lieutenant General J. F. R. Jacob | 27 November 1999 | 8 May 2003 |
30 | Om Prakash Verma | 8 May 2003 | 3 November 2004 |
31 | Akhlaqur Rahman Kidwai | 3 November 2004 | 16 November 2004 |
32 | General Sunith Francis Rodrigues | 16 November 2004 | 22 January 2010 |
32 | Shivraj Patil | 22 January 2010 | incumbent |
Sunday 27 January 2013
Governors Of Punjab
Labels:
ਪੰਜਾਬ
Subscribe to:
Post Comments (Atom)
No comments:
Post a Comment